Vision Service Plan v. Nouveau Vision, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Vision Service Plan
Defendant: Nouveau Vision, Inc. and Timothy J. Sutich
Case Number: 2:2016cv01049
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/8/17: Expert Witness disclosure date shall be continued to 4/2/2018. Discovery cutoff date shall be continued to 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motions hearing deadline shall be cont inued to 5/3/2018. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 7/26/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial is continued to 9/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/30/2017 ORDERING The deposition of Defendant Timothy J. Sutich will take place on Thursday, 9/13/2017 commencing at 10:00 a.m. at the offices of Atkinson Baker located at 641 Fulton Avenue, Suit e 200, Sacramento, CA. The deposition of Nouveau Vision, Inc. will then take place immediately after the conclusion of the deposition of Sutich. This Stipulation and Order shall be binding on the parties and treated as if Plaintiff VSP had filed a Motion to Compel the Depositions of Defendants Nouveau and Sutich, and an order has been entered in favor of Plaintiff VSP in accordance with FRCP Rules 26, 30 and 34. (Reader, L)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2017 ORDERING that the discovery cutoff date is CONTINUED to 11/30/2017. The expert witness disclosure date is CONTINUED to 1/31/2018. No other dates are being continued by this Order. (Zignago, K.)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/19/16. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Service Plan v. Nouveau Vision, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Service Plan
Represented By: Alan N. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouveau Vision, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sutich
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?