Johnson v. Ahn et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Joon I. Ahn, Shin S. Ahn and Clear Three, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01079
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/22/2017 ORDERING this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The matter having now been resolved in its entirety, the Clerk is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/24/17. The Court hereby VACATES all currently dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/11/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/12/2017 ORDERING that the VDRP session occur within 6 months; ORDERINGthat the Neutral's confirmation be filed by 6/16/2017. (cc: VDRP) (Michel, G.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/29/16: The deadline to Respond to Initial Complaint for all defendants shall be extended to August 8, 2016.(Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joon I. Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shin S. Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Three, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?