Bratton v. Shinette et al
Plaintiff: Tory Bratton
Defendant: E. Shinette, Cluadile, Jeff McCombers and R. Largent
Case Number: 2:2016cv01084
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/4/2018 SETTING Settlement Conference for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before a federal Magistrate Judge. A representative with full and unlimited authority to negotiate and enter into a binding sett lement on the defendants' behalf shall attend in person. Those in attendance must be prepared to discuss the claims, defenses and damages. The parties are DIRECTED to exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference. (CC Litigation Office at CSP - Sacramento via Fax) (Huang, H)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/11/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 23 , 24 motions to compel are GRANTED to the extent that: (a) Defendants shall provide plaintiff with the Confidential Appeal Inquiry and Force Critique Pac kage documents referenced supra. These documents may be redacted as necessary to protect the confidential information of correctional staff and nonparty inmates; (b) Within 14 days, defendants shall provide plaintiff with signed verifications (as spe cified supra) for discovery items five, seven, eight, nine, ten, and twelve; (c) Plaintiff's motions to compel are DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff's 25 motion for extension of time is GRANTED and his second amended complaint is deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's 29 , 33 , 34 motions to exclude evidence are DENIED without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff's 32 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tory Bratton signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to t he Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. Shinette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tory Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Shinette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cluadile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCombers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?