Joli Grace, LLC v. Country Visions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joli Grace, LLC
Defendant: Country Visions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01138
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal 57 signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B Shubb on 12/11/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/18/2017 ORDERING the Discovery Motion to Compel Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 11/24/2017; Deadline to file all motions, except motions for continuance, TROs or other emergency applications, is EXTENDED to 12/4/2017; the Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/5/2017 ORDERING that Disclosure of Experts and Reports is EXTENDED to 8/16/2017. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure and Reports is EXTENDED to 9/14/2017. Close of Discovery and Motion to Compel Discovery is EXTENDED to 10/25/2017. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/1/2017. (Washington, S)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/30/2016 re 17 Motion to Dismiss and 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: IT IS ORDERED that Arthur Lancaster and Love Grace's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is , GRANTED on the ground of lack of personal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Trust and Thornhill's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED on the ground of lack of personal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sta cie Lancaster and Joli Grace's Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss counter-claimant's first amended counterclaim be, and the same hereby is: 1) GRANTED with respect to claims seven, eight, and nine; and 2) DENIED in all other respects. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that counter-claimant's motion for preliminary injunction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Counter-claimant has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended counterclaim, if it can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/23/16: HEARING as to 17 Motion to Dismiss continued to 11/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joli Grace, LLC v. Country Visions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joli Grace, LLC
Represented By: W. Michael Garner, PHV
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Visions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?