Wright v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Sheron R Wright
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01193
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/2018 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/17 ORDERING that Discovery shall be completed by 1/19/2018. All Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 3/27/2018 and heard on 4/24/18 at 1:30 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is SET for 7/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/16/2017 ORDERING all parties to disclose expert witnesses and exchange expert reports by 10/20/2017; ORDERING all parties to disclose rebuttal expert witnesses and exchange reports by 11/17/2017. (Michel, G.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/17/17 ORDERING that the court's Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: Mutual disclosure of expert witnesses and exchange of expert reports are due 08/18/17 with any rebuttal expert witnesses and exchange of reports due 09/15/17. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheron R Wright
Represented By: Ashley R. Amerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Michael R. Mordaunt
Represented By: Lori A. Reihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?