Steward v. Thumser et al

Plaintiff: Donny Steward
Defendant: G. Thumser, D. Anthony, K. Champlin, L. Perez, - Dooley, - Black and - Vivas
Case Number: 2:2016cv01232
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 95 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/01/19 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall file the October 4, 2018 deposition transcript in the court record. Plaintiffs motion for sanctions 71 is denied. Plaintiffs exhibits and privilege logs are disregarded 87 , 88 and 89 and his motions and other filings concerning discovery are denied as untimely 80 , 82 , 85 , 90 , 91 . Plaintiffs ability to file documents in this action is restricted as set forth above. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed as a sanction for plaintiff's intentional and willful refusal to participate in a properly-noticed deposition in violation of the court's order. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 94 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/31/19 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall return plaintiffs original motion and exhibits 92 to plaintiff at his address of record. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief 92 be denied without prejudice. Motion 92 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/2018 GRANTING 79 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order. The 12/13/2018 pretrial motions deadline is VACATED. (Huang, H)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/27/2018 DENYING defendants' 67 request for informal discovery phone conference. The Clerk shall fax a copy of this order to the litigation coordinator at Kern Valley State Prison. The court requests that the Kern Valley State Prison litigation coordinator deliver a copy of this order to plaintiff prior to 10/4/2018. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/13/2018 DENYING 61 Motion to Compel; DENYING 62 Request to Propound Additional Interrogatories; and DENYING without prejudice 62 Motion to Amend. If plaintiff chooses to again seek leave to amend, plaintiff must file his motion to amend, accompanied by his proposed amended pleading, within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 60 ORDER and REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/14/2018 PARTIALLY GRANTING 57 Motion as follows: defendants to provide responses to interrogatories 26, 35 through 38, and 42, within 30 days from the date of thi s order; no responses required to the remaining interrogatories; and no new discovery may be propounded by any party; and REVISING 52 Discovery and Scheduling Order as follows: reopening discovery for the sole purpose of resolving the responses to interrogatories required by this order until 10/4/2018, with any motions necessary to compel discovery provided pursuant to this order filed by that date; and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, to be filed on or before 12/13/2018. In all other respects, except as modified by this order, 52 Discovery and Scheduling order remains in effect.. (Henshaw, R)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2018 DENYING without prejudice 55 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/2018 CONSTRUING 49 Motion as a request for clarification of the 2/15/2018 reassignment order. Plaintiff's request for an investigation is denied. (Henshaw, R)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/5/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 46 request to withdraw his motion for injunctive relief. Plaintiff's 44 motion for injunctive relief is WITHDRAWN and the 45 findings and recommendations are VACATED. (Yin, K)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/18 ORDERING that the stay is temporarily lifted, solely for the purpose of resolving plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief, once the district court is sues its order addressing these findings and recommendations, the stay is re-implemented until 3/13/18. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 44 be denied without prejudice. MOTION for Injunctive Relief 44 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDU ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/14/17 ORDERING the custodian to produce Donny Steward via videoconferencing on 3/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept) (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/17. (Plummer, M)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/20/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Pla intiff's second amended complaint (ECF No. 10 ) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No. 7 ) is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff two forms for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner, a petition for writ of habeas corpus, and two applications to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner.(Dillon, M)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/6/16. New Case Number 2:16-cv-01232-KJN. Old Case Number 1:16-cv-0763-DLB. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steward v. Thumser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Thumser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Champlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?