McCormack v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Michael McCormack
Defendant: County of Sacramento and Sean Woodward
Case Number: 2:2016cv01303
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice 25 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/22/2017. Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/17, ORDERING that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 8/15/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/1/17 ORDERING that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 60 days from the date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/5/2017 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Each party shall submit confidential settlement statements to chambers seven (7) days prior to the settlement conference. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCormack
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?