Ting v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Azaria Ting
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01309
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/2018 GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/17 GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6 ) as to all claims with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Becknal, R)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/28/16 ORDERING cases 2:16-cv-1309-WBS-AC, 2:16-cv-2300-WBS-AC and 2:16-cv-00289-TLN-KJN are related. Actions denominated 2:16-cv-01309-WBS-AC and 2:16-cv-02300-WBS-AC are hereby reassign ed to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:16-cv-01309-TLN-KJN and 2:16-cv 02300-TLN-KJN. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ting v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azaria Ting
Represented By: William Lawrence Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?