Hilligas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Robert Hilligas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01382
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/19/2017 DENYING 19 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/10/17 ORDERING that Defendant shall file her response to Plaintiff's opening brief on or before 5/15/2017; any reply shall be filed on or before 6/5/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/9/17 ORDERING that the date for plaintiff to file his opening brief is EXTENDED to 03/15/17. (Kaminski, H)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/02/17 ORDERING that the date for plaintiff to file his opening brief is EXTENDED to 03/08/17. (Benson, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/4/2017 ORDERING that the time for plaintiff to file his opening brief is EXTENDED to 2/4/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/28/16. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directe d to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents for service, and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilligas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hilligas
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?