Barkley v. California Correctional Health Care Services, et al.

Plaintiff: Jermaine Barkley
Defendant: C. Smith, Peterson and W. Vaughn
Case Number: 2:2016cv01386
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/11/2018 RECOMMENDING defendants' 57 motion for summary judgment be granted; judgment be entered in favor of defendants; and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2018 DENYING without prejudice 53 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order. (Henshaw, R)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/4/2018 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the 45 order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Zignago, K.)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/26/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge to this case. Plaintiff's 47 motion for reconsideration is hereby REFERRED to US District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. The Clerk is further directed to send defendants copies of the form Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Jude and defendants shall file the form indicating whether they consent or decline magistrate jurisdiction within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/2/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 28 request for an extension of time is PARTIALLY GRANTED as follows: (a) Discovery due by 10/13/2017; (b) Pretrial Motions, except motions to compel d iscovery, shall be filed on or before 1/12/2018. Plaintiff's 27 motion for court order re subpoena is PARTIALLY GRANTED as follows: (a) Defendants shall not utilize any documents or information as to "communications sent to or recei ved from" plaintiff which they obtained through the subpoena served on Mule State Prison ; and (b) The subpoena at ECF No. 27-4 is quashed as to the request for "Additional Records: Any and all communications sent to or received from Jermaine Barkley," and otherwise unchanged. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the MCSP Litigation Coordinator. (Yin, K)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/12/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff one USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed June 20, 2016; Within 60 days fr om the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached Notice of Submission of Documents to the court, with the following documents: a. One completed USM-285 form for each defendant;b. Two copies of the endorsed complaint filed June 20, 2016; and c. One completed summons form (if not previously provided) or show good cause why he cannot provide such information.(Dillon, M)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jermaine Barkley signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/10/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkley v. California Correctional Health Care Services, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?