Fordley v. Lizarraga, et al.

Plaintiff: John Fredrick Fordley
Defendant: Lizarraga, Watson, Winfield, Garcia, Ruggerio, Lagge, Alziebler, McCloughan, Amadora, Sears, Gutierrez, Torres, O'Conner, Juriskic, Purnell and Moore
Case Number: 2:2016cv01387
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/24/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 4/20/18 motion for a temporary restraining order 65 be denied without prejudice. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 65 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/12/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 55 request for postponement of the deposition is MOOT and therefore DENIED. (Yin, K)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/14/18 ORDERING plaintiff shall have 14 days from the service of this order to file objections to the 05/03/18 findings and recommendations in case nos. 2:16-cv-1387 and 2:16-cv-1985. The cler k of court shall serve a courtesy copy of the 5/03/18 findings and recommendations in both case on plaintiff along with this order at his address of record at Mule Creek State Prison and additionally to his former address: John Fredrick Fordley AS-6507, R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility, 480 Alta Road, San Diego, CA 92179. (Plummer, M) Modified on 6/15/2018 (Plummer, M).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/03/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants November 7, 2017 motion for summary judgment 42 be GRANTED and the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Motion for Summary Judgment 42 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/3/2018 (Plummer, M).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/26/18; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's 43 Motion for TRO. (Benson, A.)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/13/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 43 motion for extension of time, construed as a motion for indefinite stay, is DENIED without prejudice; plaintiff's [ 49], 50 discovery motions are DENIED; the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on plaintiff at MCSP in addition to his address of record. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 43 motion for a temporary restraining order be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/8/2018 VACATING the 2/16/2018 Discovery deadline and 4/13/2018 Dispositive Motion deadline. (Fabillaran, J)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING 37 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 32 and 33 Motions for a continuance. (York, M)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/3/2017 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 32 , 33 motions for a continuance be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/2017 ADOPTING 29 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING without prejudice 20 Motion to Dismiss. (Donati, J)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/2017 RECOMMENDING that 20 Motion to Dismiss be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of John Fredrick Fordley signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/02/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fordley v. Lizarraga, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fredrick Fordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lagge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alziebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCloughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juriskic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?