Mihan v. Regents of the University of California et al.
Plaintiff: Kim Mihan
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, University of California, Davis, University of California Davis Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery Center, UC Davis Health System Department of Otolaryngology and Greater Sacramento Otolaryngology Society
Case Number: 2:2016cv01390
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/17/17 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by 11/15/17; Expert disclosures due 01/15/18 with any supplemental due 02/05/18 and completion of Expert Discovery 03/05/18; cutoff for all dispositive motions is 02/28/18; joint pretrial conference statement due 06/08/18 and Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benson, A)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/14/16: Settlement Conference RESET for 3/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) in Magistrate Judge Kellison's chambers. (Kaminski, H)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/18/2016 GRANTING the Regents' 13 Motion to Dismiss as follows: The court DISMISSES with prejudice all claims against U.C. Davis, the U.C. Davis Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery Center, and the U.C. Davis Health System Dept of Otolaryngology, as each of the other U.C. defendants is subsumed within the Regents; The court DISMISSES with prejudice the portions of plaintiff's first claim against the Regents that are based on Tit le III of the ADA; The court DISMISSES with prejudice plaintiff' third and fourth claims against the Regents for violations of the Unruh Act and CDPA, on account of sovereign immunity; As a result of this order, the only remaining defendant in this litigation is the Regents. (Reader, L) Modified on 11/21/2016 (Reader, L).
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/12/2016. (Michel, G.)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/01/2016 ORDERING an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff is 8/15/2016. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mihan v. Regents of the University of California et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Mihan
Represented By: Scottlynn J. Hubbard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California, Davis
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Davis Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery Center
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UC Davis Health System Department of Otolaryngology
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Sacramento Otolaryngology Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?