Television Education, Inc. v. Contractors Intelligence School, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Television Education, Inc.
Defendant: Contractors Intelligence School, Inc. and Contractors Publisher, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01433
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/8/2017 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 64 , 85 Motions to Compel to 8/30/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Michel, G.)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/11/2017 DENYING 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/2017 re 48 , 53 , 58 Requests to Seal Document(s): IT IS ORDERED that the parties' requests to seal in connection with the motion for preliminary injunction and plaintiff's ex parte motion to strike are DENIED without prejudice.. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/12/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff Television Education, Inc. is GRANTED LEAVE to file a Second Amended Complaint within 20 days; the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is MODIFIED as fo llows: deadline to disclose experts is extended to 8/28/2017; the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is extended to 9/25/2017; and the deadline to complete all discovery is extended to 10/27/2017; that the deadline to file motions is extended to 12/4/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb ; Jury Trial set for 4/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/13/2017 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is MODIFIED so that the deadline to disclose experts and produce reports in accordance with FRCP 26(a) (2) shall be EXTENDED to 5/1/2017; the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts and produce reports shall be EXTENDED to 5/30/2017; and the deadline to complete expert discovery only shall be EXTENDED to 6/30/2017. (Jackson, T)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/17. (Kastilahn, A)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/12/2016 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Defendants have twenty-one days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended answer, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/20/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff Television Education, Inc. has leave to file the First Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial. Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of entry of this Order. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Television Education, Inc. v. Contractors Intelligence School, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractors Intelligence School, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractors Publisher, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Television Education, Inc.
Represented By: Bashar Ahmad
Represented By: Michael E. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?