Fein v. City of Benicia
Plaintiff: Jason Fein
Defendant: City of Benicia
Case Number: 2:2016cv01461
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/06/18 APPROVING 51 Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Case is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/13/2018 CONTINUING discovery deadline to 8/27/2018. (Zignago, K.)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/26/2018 GRANTING stipulation to allow Lisa Krimsky to join this action as a collective action member. Plaintiff's counsel shall file her Consent to be included as an Individual Plaintiff. (Fabillaran, J)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/18 ORDERING that the fact discovery cutoff date is CONTINUED until 6/27/2018 and all other dates in the scheduling order shall be adjusted accordingly. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/7/2017 ORDERING that the fact discovery cutoff date is CONTINUED until 3/27/2017 and all other dates in the scheduling order are adjusted accordingly. (Zignago, K.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/2/2017 ORDERING The proposed Notice to putative collective action class members, hereto as Exhibit A, is fair, accurate and reasonable. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Defendan t shall distribute the Notice attached to Exhibit A to all current or former employees of the City of Benicia who have worked overtime and received cash payments in lieu of health care benefits within the same pay period at any time since 6/27/2013, and provide proof of distribution of the Notice to Plaintiffs counsel upon request. (Reader, L)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/31/17 ORDERING that MOTION for conditional Certification 22 is GRANTED. The Court preliminarily certifies an FLSA collective action for: All current or former employees of the City of Benicia who have worked overtime and received cash payments in lieu of health care benefits within the same pay period at any time since 6/27/13; and Directs that the parties submit a joint proposal for notice to the class, or separate statements as to why no such joint proposal could be reached within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/16/17, ORDERING that the fact discovery cutoff date is CONTINUED to 11/27/2017 and all other dates in the scheduling order be adjusted accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 6 Motion for Conditional Certification and Facilitated Notice signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/25/17. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fein v. City of Benicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Fein
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Benicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?