Ellis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lynnette Ellis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01490
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Health Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/8/2017 DENYING 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel.
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/19/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for remand 16 is DENIED; the Commissioner's motion for summary judgment 17 is GRANTED; and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the Commissioner's favor. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/1/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM; Within 14 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM). (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?