Williams v. Hutson, et al.
Plaintiff: Antonio Ronnell Williams
Defendant: Hutson and Moore
Case Number: 2:2016cv01495
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2020 ADOPTING IN FULL 84 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 55 , 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Tupolo, A)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/28/2019 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendant Hutson's 58 motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/6/2018 GRANTING 54 Motion for Extension of Time. All pretrial motions, except motions to compeldiscovery, to be filed by 8/10/2018. All other directives in 38 Scheduling Order remain in full force and effect. (Henshaw, R)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/16/18 DENYING 33 request for entry of default. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/9/2017 DENYING 21 Motion for Sanctions. (York, M)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/2017 ORDERING Clerk to return summons and USM forms to be completed and refilled; Clerk to provide Plaintiff with another copy of the 4/25/2017 amended complaint; and Plaintiff to submit completed summons, USM forms, and copies of the amended complaint to effect service within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/26/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to respond and show cause, within 21 days of this order's entry, why his claims should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. (Henshaw, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Antonio Ronnell Williams signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/29/2017 ORDERING that the Director of CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and forward to the Clerk o f the Court. Thereafter, the Director shall collect monthly payments from plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit on the Director, CDCR. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc: Financial and CDCR) (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hutson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ronnell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?