Ramirez v. Burwell et al
Petitioner: Albertina Ramirez
Respondent: Sylvia Matthews Burwell, Robert Carey, Mark Greenberg, Brent Cardall, Bobbie Gregg, Loretta E. Lynch and Juan P. Osuna
Case Number: 2:2016cv01511
Filed: July 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/25/2017 ORDERING petitioner to SHOW CAUSE on or before 5/1/2017 why this case should not be dismissed as moot. (Yin, K)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/30/17. The court grants the parties' requests to seal the unredacted versions of these documents. The parties shall, within 14 days of the entry of this order, file appropriately redacted versions of these documents sufficient to protect P.A.'s personal information.(Dillon, M)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/17 ORDERING that the court grants the parties requests to seal the unredacted versions of these documents and orders that redacted versions be filed. The parties shall, within 14 days of the entry of this order, file appropriately redacted versions of these documents sufficient to protect P.A.s personal information.(Dillon, M)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/2016 ORDERING petitioner's 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot; petitioner's 43 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Petition is DENIED as moot; petitioner's 49 Motion Regarding Psychological Evaluation is DENIED as moot; the orders issed by the court on 11/30/2016 and 12/1/2016 soliciting supplemenatal briefing from the parties are hereby VACATED; and within 7 days, the parties shall submit a joint status report informing the court of the status of P.A.'s custody and any progress the parties have made toward the ultimate resolution of the case. (Yin, K)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/2016 ORDERING that the hearing on Petitioner's 49 Emergency Motion Re: Psychological Examination is SET for 12/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Counsel for Respondents, Vinita Andrapalliyal, may appear at the hearing telephonically. (Zignago, K.)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/3/2016 GRANTING 37 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). The following documents are hereby sealed indefinitely: Exhibit B of Respondents' notice informing this Court of Petitioner P.A.'s transfer to a staff secure facility. (Butolph, J)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/16 ORDERING that respondents' August 1, 2016 request to seal (ECF No. 12 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as follows: Exhibits B, C, F, G, H, I, J, K, M, O, P, T, and U shall be filed under seal. Within 7 days, respondents shall email these exhibits in PDF format to approvedsealed@caed.uscourts.gov. The Clerk of Court shall file those exhibits under seal. Access to those documents is restricted to the court, the part ies, and authorized court personnel. The request to seal is denied with respect to the brief and exhibits A, D, E, L, N, Q, R, S, V, W, and X, without prejudice. Respondent may file a new request to seal, along with the brief and exhibits A, D, E, L, N, Q, R, S, V, W, and X with proposed redactions, within 21 days of the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albertina Ramirez
Represented By: Holly Cooper
Represented By: Carter Capps White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sylvia Matthews Burwell
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Carey
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Greenberg
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brent Cardall
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobbie Gregg
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan P. Osuna
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?