Pickard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ahsha Pickard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01545
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER for the award of Attorney's fees pursuant to the equal access to justice act 28 U.S.C. § 2412(D) signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/27/18. This award is without prejudice to the rights of Plaintiff's counsel to seek Social Security Act attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406, subject to the provisions of the EAJA.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/08/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; that defendant's 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be denied and that this matter be remanded for further proceedings. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/24/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file her Reply to the 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 7/3/2017. (Michel, G.)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/12/2017 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to respond to the 17 Motion for Summary Judgment by 5/3/2017. (Michel, G.)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/2/2017 ORDERING that the plaintiff's time to file her Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment herein is EXTENDED for a period of 1 day, to Thursday, 3/2/2017. (Zignago, K.)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/4/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file her motion for summary judgment and/or remand is EXTENDED to 3/1/2017. (Zignago, K.)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/18/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahsha Pickard
Represented By: David J. Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?