Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc. vs United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Sylvia Burwell and Mary Smith
Case Number: 2:2016cv01546
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/2017 ORDERING the parties to file dispositional documents by 4/10/2017. (Washington, S)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/18/2017 ORDERING the parties to file dispositional documents by 3/13/2017. (Michel, G.)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/28/2016 ORDERING the defendants to file a responsive pleading to the 1 Complaint by 1/30/2017; ORDERING the parties to prepare and file a joint status report by 2/6/2017. CASE STAYED. (Michel, G.)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/22/16 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED for 3 months for the parties to resolve this matter; the parties are relieved of their obligation to file a joint status report until after the expiration of the 3-month stay of proceedings. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter by 11/21/16, the defendants will file a responsive pleading to the Complaint by 12/05/16, and the parties will prepare and file a joint status repo rt by 12/12/16. The parties have agreed not to exchange Initial Disclosures at this time and will address the exchange of Initial Disclosures in their joint status report if this matter is not resolved through the parties' settlement discussions. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc. vs United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Phillip Bailey
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?