Wilson v. California Medical Facility et al
Plaintiff: David W. Wilson
Defendant: California Medical Facility, Michael C. Smith, Jacob Smith, Larry Lesane, J. Stephensen, Clinton D. Thomas, Richard Godfrey, W. Harris, N. Strickland, S. Jensen, Brown, Pryor, Hank Blank, Robert W Fox, D. Artis and M. Voong
Case Number: 2:2016cv01547
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/16/2020 ADOPTING 38 Findings and Recommendations in full;GRANTING 27 Motion to Revoke IFP Status; REVOKING plaintiff's IFP status; GRANTING 35 Motion to Strike; STRIKING 33 Counterclaim; and DIRECTING plaintiff to pay the filing fees for this case in full within 30 days. (Coll, A)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/29/2020 RECOMMENDING that: 1) Defendant's Motion to Revoke IFP Status (ECF No. 27 ) be granted; 2) Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Counterclaim (E CF No. 35 ) be granted; and 3) Plaintiff be required to pay the full filing fee within 30 days of the date of the District Judge's order adopting these Findings and Recommendations. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/4/2020 DENYING 25 Motion for Reconsideration. (York, M)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/2/2020 GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to respond to Plaintiffs complaint, if necessary, until 30 days after the Court issues a final ruling on 27 Motion to Revoke Plaintiffs IFP Status. (Henshaw, R)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/16/19 ADOPTING in full 19 findings and recommendatons. California Medical Facility and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation are DISMISSED as immune defendants with respect to Plaintiff's constitutional claims. (Kastilahn, A)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/28/19 RECOMMENDING that California Medical Facility and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation be dismissed as immune defendants. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/15/18 ORDERING plaintiffs complaint is dismissed with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/18/16 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David W. Wilson. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. California Medical Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lesane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stephensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?