Parnell v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: J. P. Parnell
Defendant: A. Martinez, A. Whalen, V. Estrella and J. Curiel
Case Number: 2:2016cv01556
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/18 GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days within which to file objections to the court's 9/19/18 findings and recommendations.(Coll, A)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/19/18 RECOMMENDING that 33 plaintiffs motion for leave to exceed the 20-page limitation imposed upon plaintiffs second amended complaint be denied. Plaintiffs second amended compliant be dismissed without leave to amend; and this case be closed. Motion 33 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/19/2018 (Plummer, M).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/28/2018 GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension OF Time. Plaintiff granted until 3/19/2018 to file a second amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/2017 GRANTING 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted until 11/20/2017 to file a second amended complaint. (Hunt, G)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/2017 DENYING 21 Motion to Transfer Exhibits. (Henshaw, R)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/27/17 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/05/17 ORDERING that the 10 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Benson, A)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of J. P. Parnell signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/23/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/13/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parnell v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Curiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?