Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James D.A. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01561
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2017 ORDERING 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; the Commissioner's 27 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; the final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED and Judgment is ENTERED for the Commissioner; the Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/2017 GRANTING 21 Motion for leave to file a late motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is DEEMED TIMELY FILED. (Washington, S)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within 14 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM) (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D.A. Smith
Represented By: Jared Thomas Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?