Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Etta Moore
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01676
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for payment of plaintiff's attorney fees signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/28/17. (Kaminski, H)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/25/2017 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. Judgment entered in plaintiff's favor. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/06/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 01/15/17. (Benson, A)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/21/16: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Moore
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Urmila R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?