Howze v. Malmendier et al
Plaintiff: J. L. Howze
Defendant: Rick Malmendier and A Brage
Case Number: 2:2016cv01737
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/12/18 GRANTING 20 Motion for relief from the 8/30/17 order. The 8/30/17 order 19 is vacated. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's amended complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/30/17 ordering that plaintiff shall submit within 21 days from the date of this order, the appropriate filing ffee. (Plummer, M)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of J.L. Howze signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/03/17. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/2/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 9 motion for reconsideration; and the 11/22/2016 Order 8 is VACATED. (Yin, K)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/22/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 21 days from the date of this order, the appropriate filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Dillon, M)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/02/16 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howze v. Malmendier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L. Howze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Malmendier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Brage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?