Lansing v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucille Lansing
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01840
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/1/2017 GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's Request for Substitution of Attorney adding Attorney Danny A. Barak for Lucille Lansing. Attorney Mae-Elaine Quijano Ednalaga and Tala Rezai terminated. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER extending the deadline to serve Initial Disclosures by 1/2/2018 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/20/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER 28 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/28/2017 extending the deadline to serve Initial Disclosures to 11/28/2017.(Kirksey Smith, K)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/5/17: Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. has up to and including October 11, 2017 to respond to the complaint. (Kaminski, H)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/7/2017 GRANTING 20 Defendant's Ex Parte Application extending time for defendant to respond to the complaint by 9/8/2017. A Status Conference is set for 11/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 10/23/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/7/2017 GRANTING 18 Defendant's Ex Parte Application: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Caliber to respond to the Complaint is continued from 4/12/2017, up to and including 7/10/2017. The Scheduling Conference is dropped from the calendar. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 8/14/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/30/2017 GRANTING 14 Defendant's Ex Parte Application: IT IS ORDERED that: 1) The deadline for Caliber to respond to the Complaint is continued to 4/12/2017; 2) The last day for the parti es to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) is continued to 3/27/2017; 3) The last day to file the Joint Status Report is continued to 4/10/2017; and 4) The Scheduling Conference is continued to 4/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/29/16 ORDERING that The deadline for Caliber to respond to the Complaint, is CONTINUED from 12/12/16, up to and including 2/10/17. The last day for the parties to meet and confer p ursuant to Rule 26(f) is CONTINUED up to and including 1/27/17; The last day to file the Joint Status Report is CONTINUED up to and including 2/13/17; and the Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 12/19/16 to 2/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/12/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is CONTINUED from 10/11/2016, up to and including 12/12/2016. (Jackson, T)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/9/2016 ORDERING the deadline for defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is CONTINUED from 8/11/2016, up to and including 10/11/2016. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lansing v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Lansing
Represented By: Erikson M. Davis
Represented By: Mae-Elaine Quijano Ednalaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?