Lacey v. Taylor
Plaintiff: Ronnie Sterling Lacy
Defendant: T. Taylor and State of California
Case Number: 2:2016cv01859
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/21/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/10/17 denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting 18 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file a second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/27/2017 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint; and plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint. (Yin, K)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronnie Sterling Lacy signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and fo rward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacey v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Sterling Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?