Duke v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Duke
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America and EMS Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01888
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 02/15/2017 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice; and that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. (Jackson, T)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/8/2017 DISMISSING this case without prejudice; VACATING all deadlines and hearings; DENYING all pending motions as moot; GRANTING the parties the right to reopen this action within 60 days; CAUTIONING all parties that this dismissal will be with prejudice if a request to reinstate the case is not filed and served on opposing counsel within 60 days. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/22/2016 ORDERING the parties to refer to the standing orders of Judge Chhabria. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED and must be RESCHEDULED consistent with this order and the applicable rules. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Duke
Represented By: Daniel Scott Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?