Porter v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al.
Plaintiff: Kristi Porter
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Gregory S. Everett
Case Number: 2:2016cv01933
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/24/2017 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/26/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the 28 Motion to Dismiss is RESET to 7/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Remand and granting 16 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/27/17: If Plaintiff chooses to amend, she must file her amended complaint within twenty days of the date of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/9/2017 ORDERING that the hearing date for 16 the Motion to Dimiss, and 14 Motion to Remand are CONTINUED to 2/7/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Porter
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Everett
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?