Federal Energy Regulatory Commission v. ETRACOM LLC et al.

Petitioner: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Respondent: ETRACOM LLC and Michael Rosenberg
Case Number: 2:2016cv01945
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 6/4/2018 ORDERING this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); and without costs or fees to any party; all deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED at MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 2/13/2018 GRANTING 31 Motion to Stay. CASE STAYED. (Hunt, G)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 6/14/2017 GRANTING 28 Motion to Seal. (Michel, G.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 4/14/2017 ORDERING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM, before District Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Reader, L)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REGARDING SCOPE OF REVIEW signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 3/7/2017 ORDERING The FRCP shall govern this action. Pursuant to 16:823b(d)(3), the Court shall review the penalty order issued by the FERC de novo both as to the facts and the law. The parties are encouraged to either stipulate to a discovery schedule or request a discovery conference with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order and forward copies to counsel. (Reader, L)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 12/6/2016 ORDERING that the parties shall file simultaneous briefing regarding the scope of review under the Federal Power Act no later than 1/23/2017. Any response shall be due by 2/3/2017. Petitioner's 17 Motion to Affirm Civil Penalties is STAYED pending resolution of procedural matters. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order and forward copies to counsel. (Jackson, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission v. ETRACOM LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ETRACOM LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Connolly, PHV
Represented By: Robert S. Fleishman, PHV
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Paul C. Varnado, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Rosenberg
Represented By: Matthew J. Connolly, PHV
Represented By: Robert S. Fleishman, PHV
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Paul C. Varnado, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Represented By: Catherine Carswell Collins
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Lloyd
Represented By: John Russell Matson, III
Represented By: Katherine Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?