Keel v. Foulk et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Ray Keel
Defendant: F. Foulk, J Ramsey, W. Pine, B Flemmings and M Esobar
Case Number: 2:2016cv01946
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/11/2021 GRANTING 55 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file and serve his opposition on or before June 28, 2021.(Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/04/21 ORDERING Within seven days of the date of this order, defendants shall reserve their motion to dismiss on plaintiff at his new address of record: Ricky Ray KeelC-34945, Salinas Valley St ate Prison, PO Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93960-1050. Defendants shall also file with the court, within seven days of this order, a new proof of service. Within 21 days of service, plaintiff shall file either an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to defendants motion. Defendants may file a reply to plaintiffs opposition, if any, 7 days thereafter.(Plummer, M)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/14/2021 ADOPTING 39 Findings and Recommendations in full; All of the claims in Plaintiff's third amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice except for the retaliation claims against Fleming and Pine; and The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for service on Fleming and Pine.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/22/20 ORDERING the Clerk shall randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that all of the claims in plaintiff's third amended c omplaint be dismissed without prejudice save for his retaliation claims against Flening and Pine. If these recommendations are adopted, this matter should be referred back to the undersigned for service on Fleming and Pine. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/18/2020 GRANTING 35 Motion for Extension of Time. Third Amended Complaint due 60 days from the date this order. (Tupolo, A)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/06/20 Plaintiffs second amended complaint 29 is dismissed with leave to file a third amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/9/2019 GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his amended complaint. (Huang, H)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/27/2018 DISMISSING 14 Amended Complaint with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action. (Huang, H)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/14/2017 GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ricky Ray Keel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keel v. Foulk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Ray Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Flemmings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Esobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?