Fordley v. Lizarraga et al

Plaintiff: John Fredrick Fordley
Defendant: Joe Lizarraga, Winkfield, Garcia, Watson, Moore, Shrode, Andrea and Coder
Case Number: 2:2016cv01985
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/27/2018 RECOMMENDING that 46 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted as to all remaining claims and that the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/30/18. Within 45 days, Plaintiff shall file a supplemental opposition to the 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, including all evidence h e wishes to present to show that he filed a grievance concerning the claims in this action in March 2016. Defendants are granted 21 days after the filing of Plaintiff's supplemental opposition to file a supplemental reply. Plaintiff is directe d to inform the court within 21 days if he cannot access his legal materials or otherwise prepare the supplemental opposition ordered by the Court. Defendants' 46 11/07/17 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART as to Plaintiff's claims that Defendants Watson, Winkfield, and Garcia provided him with razor blades on May 5 and 6, 2016 and encouraged him to commit suicide, and such claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Consideration of the remainder of Defendant's 46 11/07/17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DEFERRED pending receipt of the supplemental briefing. (Benson, A.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/30/2018 DENYING as moot 87 Motion for Extension of Time. (Henshaw, R)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/14/18 ORDERING plaintiff shall have 14 days from the service of this order to file objections to the 05/03/18 findings and recommendations in case nos. 2:16-cv-1387 and 2:16-cv-1985. The cler k of court shall serve a courtesy copy of the 5/03/18 findings and recommendations in both case on plaintiff along with this order at his address of record at Mule Creek State Prison and additionally to his former address: John Fredrick Fordley AS-6507, R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility, 480 Alta Road, San Diego, CA 92179. (Plummer, M)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/6/2018 STRIKING 80 Reply Brief, as there is no pending motion for temporary restraining order in this action. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/03/18 RECOMMENDING that within 45 days of the date of any order adopting these recommendations, plaintiff be directed to file a supplemental opposition to the motion for summary judgment, including all evidence plaintiff wishes to present to show that he filed a grievance concerning the claims in this action in March 2016. Defendants be given 21 days after the filing of plaintiffs supplemental opposition to file a su pplemental reply. Plaintiff be directed to inform the court within 21 days of the date of any order adopting these recommendations if he cannot access his legal materials or otherwise prepare the supplemental opposition ordered by the court. Defend ants November 7, 2017 motion for summary judgment 46 be granted in part as to plaintiffs claims that defendants Watson, Winkfield, and Garcia provided him with razor blades on May 5 and 6, 2016 and encouraged him to commit suicide, and that such cl aims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Consideration of the remainder of defendants November 7, 2017 motion for summary judgment be deferred pending receipt of the supplemental briefing. Motion for Summary Judgment 46 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/3/2018 (Plummer, M).
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING 68 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/17/18 DENYING with prejudice 48 Motion for TRO (Benson, A.)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/13/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 48 motion for extension of time, construed as a motion for indefinite stay is DENIED without prejudice; plaintiff's [54 ], 55 , 56 , 57 , 58 , 59 , 60 , 61 , 62 discovery motions are DENIED; the Clerk shall provide plaintiff with one blank subpoena form; and the Clerk shall also serve a copy of this order on plaintiff at MCSP and RJDCF. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 48 motion for a temporary restraining order be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/8/2018 VACATING the 2/16/2018 Discovery Deadline and 4/13/2018 Dispositive Motion Deadline. (Fabillaran, J)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/4/2017 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed October 4, 2017, (ECF No. 41 ) are ADOPTED in full and Plaintiff's motions for a continuance (ECF Nos. 35 , 36 , 37 ) are DENIED.(Becknal, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/3/2017 RECOMMENDING 35 , 36 , and 37 Motions for Continuance be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER adopting 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 18 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/29/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/2017 ADOPTING 29 Findings and Recommendations in full. Defendants Andrea and Moore are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. (Donati, J)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/2017 RECOMMENDING that 18 Motion to Dismiss be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/20/2017 RECOMMENDING that defendants Andrea and Moore be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/30/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall mail plaintiff two forms USM-285. Within 30 days from the date this order is served, plaintiff may submit the attachedNotice of Submission of Documents with the completed forms USM-285 providing new instructions for service of process upon defendants Moore and Andrea.(Dillon, M)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of John F. Fordley signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/15/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fordley v. Lizarraga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fredrick Fordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?