Logan v. Gamboa
Plaintiff: James David Logan, II
Defendant: D. L. Gamboa and D.L. Birdsong
Case Number: 2:2016cv02020
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/28/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE the 51 second amended complaint. Plaintiff' s 53 motion to amend the complaint is DENIED. Plaintiff's 57 motion for extension of time is DENIED. Plaintiff's 48 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 34 motion to proceed IFP be denied. The 49 first amended complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 46 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/9/2017 DENYING AS MOOT 44 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 30 days from service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/23/2017 ORDERING plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this action without further warning. Plaintiff's 38 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Yin, K)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/31/17 ORDERING that the original 1 complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days leave to amend; amended complaints 6 , 7 , 11 , 12 , 13 , 15 , 16 , 17 26 are STRICKEN; plaintiff shall submit A pplication to Proceed IFP within 30 days; plaintiff's 2 , 18 , 19 , 20 , 25 , 28 , 30 Motions for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED; plaintiff's 8 request for PLU status is DENIED; plaintiff's 21 request to issue subpoenas is DENIED; plaintiff's 22 24 requests for transfer are DENIED; plaintiff's 27 request for discovery is DENIED; and plaintiff's 29 request for service forms is DENIED. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James David Logan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. L. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.L. Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?