Merriman v. Telander et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Merriman
Defendant: James Telander, Jerusik, Ivey, Romano, Kentner, Blain, Wallis and Lowry
Case Number: 2:2016cv02030
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/11/18 RECOMMENDING that 53 Motion to Amend the Complaint be denied; 54 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; and this case be summarily dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 day after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/26/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Dominique Merriman AT-0219, before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes, to appear by video-conferencing, on 10/4/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the MCSP Warden and the Litigation Coordinator. (cc: DB, Sac I.T. Dept.) (Yin, K)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/2/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 49 are ADOPTED in FULL; and Plaintiff's 26 , 29 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED.(Reader, L)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/2018 RECOMMENDING 26 and 29 Motions for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/8/2018 DISCHARGING the 38 order to show cause; DENYING as moot plaintiff's 27 , 30 , 33 motions for court order directing defendants to answer complaint; and GRANTING plaintiff's 40 motion for extension of time to and plaintiff shall have 14 days to submit his reply to defendants' opposition to his motion for preliminary injunction. (Yin, K)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/22/2018 ORDERING Defendants to show cause, in writing and within 7 days, why default should not be entered against them for failure to answer plaintiff's complaint within the allotted time. (Fabillaran, J)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/5/2018 GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants have until February 8, 2018 to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Fabillaran, J)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING 21 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 18 Motion to Dismiss. (York, M)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/5/2017 RECOMMENDING that 18 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/3/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 2/21/17 10 are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction 2 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/21/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Dominique Merriman and forward payment to the court until the bala nce is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merriman v. Telander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Merriman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Telander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerusik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?