Fagan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Larry J. Fagan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02051
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/23/18 GRANTING 39 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is entitled to recover reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $8,130.30. Defendant shall pay these fees and costs directly to Plaintiff's counsel, subject to any government debt offset and subject to the government's waiver of the requirements under the Anti-Assignment Act. (Coll, A)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/24/2018 DEEMING the 30 Objections to Findings and Recommendations as Timely. (York, M)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/2/18 Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 15 be granted; Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 17 be denied; The Commissione r's decision be reversed. This matter be remanded for the immediate award of benefits; and The Clerk of the Court be directed to enter judgment for Plaintiff and close this case. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/27/17, DENYING Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2017 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 19 motion to amend be denied. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry J. Fagan
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?