Ramey v. Franco et al
Plaintiff: Johnney Ramey
Defendant: J. Franco, J. Caplin, F. Leckie, K. Shultz, N. Peterson, A. Bagler, R. J. Rackley, G. Anderson and L. Cohayal
Case Number: 2:2016cv02107
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/20/19 DENYING 54 , 66 , and 68 motions to expedite this case for trial; DENYING 56 motion to compel; and DENYING 64 motion to appoint counsel. Also, R ECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 51 be granted and the second amended complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Motion 51 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/2019 GRANTING 50 motion for reconsideration. The 43 order withdrawing the 2/8/2018 findings and recommendations and denying defendant's motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is AFFIRMED. (Zignago, K.)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/24/18 ORDERING the Court stays all discovery pending resolution of Defendants motion for reconsideration 50 and Defendants motion for summary judgment on the issue of exhaustion 51 . The Co urt also vacates the discovery deadlines and the pretrial motion deadlines in its April 17, 2018 Discovery and Scheduling Order 45 . The Court will reset these deadlines and will issue an Amended Discovery and Scheduling Order in the event that both of Defendants motions are denied. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/15/2018 GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted a 45 day extension, up to and including 7/19/2018, to respond to Plaintiff's first set of discovery requests. (Henshaw, R)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/19/2018 WITHDRAWING the 39 recommendations to grant defendant's motion to revoke plaintiff's ifp status and DENYING defendant's 28 motion to revoke plaintiff's ifp status. Defendant shall file a response to the second amended complaint within 21 days. (Yin, K)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/8/2018 GRANTING Defendant's 29 Request for Judicial Notice and DENYING Plaintiff's 35 Request for Judicial Notice. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that [ 28] Motion to Revoke IFP Status be granted and plaintiff be ordered to pay the entire $400.00 in required fees within 30 days or face dismissal of the case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Fabillaran, J)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/12/17 DENYING 37 Motion to open discovery. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/21/2017 ORDERING, within 21 days, plaintiff must respond to defendant's 28 motion to revoke his ifp status. Defendant Anderson's deadline to file a response to the complaint is VACATED and will be re-set, as necessary, upon resolution of the motion to revoke plaintiff's ifp status. (Yin, K)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/03/14 ORDERING that the claims against defendants Franco, Leckie, Shultz, Caplin, Peterson, Bagler, and Cohayal are DISMISSED without leave to amend and without prejudice to re-filing in a separate action. (Benson, A.)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/8/2017 ORDERING the 3/1/2017 findings and recommendations 17 are WITHDRAWN. Service is appropriate for G. Anderson. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms f or service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the claims against defendants Franco, Leckie, Shultz, Caplin, Peterson, Bagler, and Cohayal be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/1/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice and this case closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/20/16 ORDERING that the December 5, 2016 findings and recommendations are VACATED; The Clerk of Court is directed to re-serve the October 20, 2016 order on plaintiff; and plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint per the October 20, 2016 order. Failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this action.(Dillon, M)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Johnney Ramey signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. Franco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnney Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Caplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Leckie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Bagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Cohayal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?