McDowell v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Kentha McDowell
Defendant: Robert W. Fox, D. Artis and Chief Medical Officer
Case Number: 2:2016cv02144
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/18 RECOMMENDING that all claims arising under the heading "Second Cause of Action" in plaintiff's fourth amended complaint be dismissed; defendants Dr. Mehta and Warden Fox be dismissed; Plaintiff's "First Cause of Action" be transferred to the United States District Court of the Central District of California; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(Coll, A)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/29/18 ORDERING plaintiff's third amended complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a fourth amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/27/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district court judge to this case, and RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 13 second amended complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and this case be closed. Assigned and Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/1/2017 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint; and plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kentha McDowell signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/15/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/8/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentha McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?