Bryant v. Shasta County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Bryant
Defendant: Shasta County Sheriff's Department, County of Shasta and A. Clark
Case Number: 2:2016cv02147
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/31/18 ORDERING That the entire action is dismissed with prejudice and the clerk of the court is directed to close the file in this matter. CASE CLOSED (Plummer, M)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/2017 ORDERING parties may conduct discovery until 5/15/2018 and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, to be filed on or before 8/15/2018. (Henshaw, R)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/7/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's amended complaint will be accepted as the operative complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue and send plaintiff 3 summonses. The Clerk shall also send plaintiff 3 copies of the form "Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge." Plaintiff shall complete service of process on defendants within 60 days. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form "Conse nt to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge" on defendants at the time the summons and amended complaint are served. Defendants are informed that they may consent to have this case tried by a U.S. Magistrate Judge while preserving their right to appeal to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. Defendants shall reply to the amended complaint within the time provided in FRCP 12(a). Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment and Fourteenth Amendment Due Process Clause claims identified under the heading "First Cause of Action" are DISMISSED. (Reader, L)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/05/17 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to issue and send plaintiff 1 summons, for defendant Clark. The clerk shall also send plaintiff a copy of the form "Consent to Proceed B efore United States Magistrate Judge." Plaintiff shall complete service of process on defendant Clark within sixty days. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge o n defendant Clark at the time the summons and complaint are served. Defendant Clark is informed that he may consent to have this case tried by a United States Magistrate Judge while preserving his right to appeal to the Circuit Court of Appeals. Def endant Clark shall reply to the complaint within the time provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a). All defendants other than defendant Clark and all claims other than plaintiffs excessive force claim against defendant Clark arising under the Fourteenth Amendment are dismissed.(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Shasta County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Shasta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Bryant
Represented By: Paul Leland Alaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?