Hairabedian et al v. Toys "R" Us - Delaware, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daron Hairabedian and Ivan Hernandez
Defendant: Toys "R" Us - Delaware, Inc. and Carol Miller
Case Number: 2:2016cv02326
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by William H Orrick, III on 03/26/19 ORDERING that, in light of the Bankruptcy Order imposing a permanent injunction on the claims asserted in this case, this case is DISMISSED and the Clerk shall close the file. (Benson, A.)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 9/21/17, ORDERING that this case is STAYED and is Administratively CLOSED. Upon notice from any party that the stay has been lifted with respect to this matter or that the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded, this matter will be restored to the docket. (Kastilahn, A)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE signed by William H Orrick, III, on 6/20/2017 ORDERING defendant to respond to the request using employee identification numbers with (1) meal and rest break data, and (2) point of sale data, for the putative class during the class period, for 13 representative stores, including the stores where plaintiffs worked. The information should be produced within thirty days pursuant to the 14 Protective Order. (Zignago, K.)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 5/12/2017. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairabedian et al v. Toys "R" Us - Delaware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daron Hairabedian
Represented By: Mark P. Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Hernandez
Represented By: Mark P. Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys "R" Us - Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Mia Farber
Represented By: Adam Y. Siegel
Represented By: Sander JC van der Heide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?