Bobo v. Fresno County Dependency Court
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis Bobo
Defendant: Fresno County Dependency Court
Case Number: 2:2016cv02339
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/26/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Washington, S)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/16/17 ORDERING that The Findings and Recommendations filed 4/4/17 3 , are not adopted, except as specifically identified above. Plaintiff's 9/30/16, application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 9/30/16, complaint 1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend; and Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint that complies with this Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/3/17 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 9/30/16 application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 be DENIED; Plaintiff's 9/30/16 complaint 1 be DISMISSED without prejudice; and this action be DISMISSED. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Within fourteen (14) days after being served with these findings and recommendations, plaintiff may file written objections with the court. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobo v. Fresno County Dependency Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis Bobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Dependency Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?