Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02349
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/8/2018 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 24 ) be DENIED; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment (Doc. 28 ) be GRANTED; and the Clerk of the Court be directed to enter judgment and close this file. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/4/17 ORDERING the Defendants time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 11/14/17. The parties further stipulate that the Court's Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. (Becknal, R)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney 23 is GRANTED. Attorney Linda Susan Ziskin TERMINATED. Attorney Shellie Lott will remain as Counsel of Record.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/21/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to File A Motion For Summary Judgment, the request is hereby APPROVED. Plaintiff shall file his Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 9/15/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/08/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 07/17/17. (Benson, A)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/18/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to proceed in forma pauperis 5 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on Plaintiff the scheduling order in social security cases; The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/13/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is DENIED without prejudice; Within 15 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall either pay the filing fees for this action or submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?