Langston v. Weber

Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Defendant: Weber
Case Number: 2:2016cv02360
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Madera
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/14/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 15, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/15/17 denying 6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit the $400.00 filing fee for this action within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 12, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/12/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?