Langston v. Williams
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Defendant: Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv02365
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/7/19 ADOPTING in full 24 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING defendant's 19 unopposed motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the full filing fee. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/18/19 RECOMMENDING that defendant's unopposed motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 19 be granted and that this action be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the full filing fee. Motion to Revoke IFP Status 19 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/18/18 DIRECTING plaintiff to submit 1 completed summons and 2 copies of the endorsed complaint to the court within 30 days. (Coll, A)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Walter Langston signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/12/2017. Plaintiff's 6 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 7 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?