Brooks v. City of Vallejo
Plaintiff: Jimmy Brooks
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2016cv02376
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/27/2018 ORDERING that the entire action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/18/18, REFERRING case to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program "VDRP". (Kastilahn, A)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/1/2018 APPROVING 24 Stipulation for Dismissal of Certain Parties and Causes of Action in the 11 First Amended Complaint. (York, M)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/31/17. (Kaminski, H)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/14/2017 ORDERING the 10 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order AMENDED as follows: Non-expert discovery to close by 5/1/2018; Expert discovery shall close 3/1/2018; Dispositive Motions filing cutoff is set for 7/1/2018; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 9/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and the Jury Trial CONTINUED to 10/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Brooks
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?