Lipelt v. Unum Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Gerald Lipelt
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02433
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by William H. Orrick, III on 9/12/2017 DISMISSING this action, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
August 14, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT signed by William H Orrick, III on 8/14/17. The Court hereby VACATES all currently set dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days. The Court sets a Status Conference/OSC for 10/17/2017 at 03:00 PM at which the parties, by and through their attorneys of record shall show cause why this case is not dismissed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 5, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 6/30/2017 EXTENDING Briefing Schedule for Motion on Standard for Review and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. (Donati, J)
April 13, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 4/12/17 ORDERING the above-entitled action is REFERRED to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. The parties agree to complete mediation on or before 6/17/17.(Becknal, R)
November 29, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by William H. Orrick, III on 11/28/2016 ORDERING the defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint by 12/15/2016. (Michel, G.)
November 17, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 11/17/17, ORDERING that the last day for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is 11/24/2016. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipelt v. Unum Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lipelt
Represented By: Hillary J. Benham-Baker
Represented By: Julia Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?