Jordan v. California Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Collette Jordan
Defendant: California Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2016cv02442
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/26/18. ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing by 5/10/2018 why her case shouldnot be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If plaintiff fails to respond to this OSC, the court will recommend dismissal of his case. The hearing on defendants 28 pending motion to compel is VACATED to be re-set as necessary. (Benson, A.)
April 13, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/13/18, ORDERING that the hearing to the motion to compel 28 is CONTINUED to 5/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall file an opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the motion, no later than 4/25/18. (Kastilahn, A)
February 28, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/27/2018 GRANTING 26 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Discovery cut-off is changed from 3/4/2018 to 7/2/2018; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses deadl ine is changed from 4/18/2018 to 8/17/2018; Supplemental Expert Disclosures deadline is changed from 5/9/2018 to 9/10/2018; Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery is changed from 6/6/2018 to 10/5/2018; Deadline to Hear Dispositive motions is changed from 7/18/2018 to 11/16/2018. (Zignago, K.)
December 8, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/08/17 ORDERING that the scheduling order issued by District Judge Kimberly J.Muller, ECF No. 19 , remains appropriate. All deadlines previously set remain binding on the parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. California Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Jordan
Represented By: Gregory Martin Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Justice
Represented By: Lisa Plank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?