Osorio et al v. Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Plaintiff: Carlos Daniel Osorio and Anil Kumar
Defendant: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Case Number: 2:2016cv02486
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/21/17 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 8 , 9 request to proceed IFP. Plaintiff's original filing 1 is DISMISSED. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and submit the Notice of Amendment, along with the required documents. The Clerk shall send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights complaint. (Yin, K)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/2017 ORDERING plaintiff Carlos D. Osorio Zuniga shall submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement and the certification required on the application form. Plaintiff Anil Kumar is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The Clerk shall (a) change plaintiff's name in court records to "Carlos Daniel Osorio Zuniga." ; (b) send plaintiff Zuniga a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/16ORDERING that both plaintiffs show cause, within 14 days, why this action should not be dismissed.(Dillon, M)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/16 ORDERING that plaintiffs shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of the request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Cler k of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiffs' failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send each plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osorio et al v. Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Daniel Osorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anil Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?