Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02489
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/21/2021 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/20/19 GRANTING 51 Motion to Stay. Not later than 60 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, and every 60 days thereafter until the appeals filed in Johnson v. Bl ackhawk Centercal, Case No. 3:17-cv-02454-WHA and Kong v. Mana Investments Company, LLC, Case No. 8:18-cv-01615-DOC-DFM have been resolved, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report concerning the status of those appellate cases. (Kastilahn, A)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/24/19. (Kaminski, H)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/23/18 DENYING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Coll, A)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/15/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/5/2018 DENYING 28 Motion to Stay. (Washington, S)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/14/2018 ORDERING that the parties may conduct the depositions of Plaintiff, Defendant, and their respective experts after the discovery cut-off. (Zignago, K.)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/21/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 8 Stipulation, that the Discovery cutoff is EXTENDED to 5/31/2018. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Shalend Shane Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?