Johnson v. Fox
Plaintiff: Herbert Johnson
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Case Number: 2:2016cv02492
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/22/18 DENYING 42 Motion for return of his filed documents. (Plummer, M)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/06/17 ORDERING the claims raised in plaintiff's 7/28 and 8/01/17 filings are construed as a second amended complaint. The second amended complaint is dismissed. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff may file a third amended complaint on the complaint form provided with this order. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/29/17 vacating 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Within 60 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall either (a) file an amended complaint in compliance with the court's 3/02/17 order, or (b) advise the court that he still does not have possession of his legal materials. The clerk of the court is directed to provide plaintiff a copy of the court's 03/02/17 order 26 and a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/7/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Herbert Johnson signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/1/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to th e Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/9/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with another copy of the in forma pauperis application used by this court; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed in forma pauperis application.(Dillon, M)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2016. C (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?