Hase v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Carvel Scott Hase
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02522
Filed: October 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/29/18 granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Kaminski, H)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/2018 GRANTING in PART and 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. The final decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a reply brief is EXTENDED to 7/17/2017. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hase v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carvel Scott Hase
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?