Martinez et al. v. City of West Sacramento et al.
Plaintiff: Sonny Martinez, Jessica Martinez, Joann Ramirez, VJM, GRM, ARM and EVM
Defendant: City of West Sacramento, West Sacramento Police Department, Jason M. Winger, David M. Stallions, Michael Duggins, Kenneth E. Fellows, Carl J. Crouch, Eric M. Palmer, Matthew S. Luiz, Louis Cameron, City of Stockton, Stockton Police Department, Dan T. Zwicky and Rafael Altamirano
Case Number: 2:2016cv02566
Filed: October 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/1/2020 GRANTING 152 Ex Parte Application for Leave to file late opposition. (Zignago, K.)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/2/19 MODIFYING Orders 123 and 125 as follows: Opposition by Plaintiffs, if any, to the City of Stockton's Rule 12 121 shall be filed on or before 1/30/20; Reply by the City, if necessary, shall be filed on or before 2/6/20; and, The hearing date shall remain the same as previously ordered, 2/20/20, 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 2, 15th Floor, before Hon. Nunley. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/2019 ADOPTING as the order of the Court 124 Stipulation. The new briefing and hearing schedule is as follows: Motion filing deadline by 12/16/2019; Oppositions file d by 1/30/2020; Replies filed by 2/6/2020; and Hearing date on 2/20/2020, at 02:00 PM. The City of Stockton's pending 121 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 2/20/2020, at 02:00 PM, in Courtroom 2 (TLN), before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (York, M)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/15/2019 CONTINUING Hearing on 121 Motion to Dismiss to 12/19/2019, at 02:00 PM, in Courtroom 2 (TLN), before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Opposition to Motion due 12/5/2019. Reply to Opposition due 12/12/2019. (York, M)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/31/19 ORDERING that Defendant Zwicky shall file his response to the 116 Second Amended Complaint by 12/09/19, and agrees to accommodate Plaintiffs' counsel's schedule such that no oppositions are due the within 7 days on either side of Christmas. Plaintiffs will have at least two weeks between due dates for opposing any motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. (Benson, A.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/7/2019 ORDERING Plaintiffs to file their Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint on or before 3/14/2019, to be heard on 5/16/2019. Defendant Zwicky's response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before 5/2/2019. (Huang, H)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/2019 ORDERING the 77 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 4/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Washington, S)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/26/2019 ORDERING that Defendant Zwicky shall not be required to file an Answer or other responsive pleading at this time. Plaintiffs and Defendant Zwicky shall file a stipulation and proposed order on or before 3/6/2019, regarding the timing of Defendant Zwickys Answer or other responsive pleading. (Huang, H)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/19 GRANTING 64 Motion for Leave to Amend as to the Non-Federal Defendants and DENYING as Moot 28 Motion to Dismiss. (Coll, A)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/2019 GRANTING United States' 44 Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiffs' 6th through 14th Claims for Relief in the 1 Complaint and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs&# 039; 64 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend their allegations against Zwicky is GRANTED as to the 1st, 4th, 5th, 6th, and 7th Claims for Relief as those claims are set forth in the proposed First Amended Complaint (FAC). Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend their allegations against Zwicky is DENIED without prejudice as to the 2nd, 3rd, and 9th through 18th Claims for Relief as those claims are set forth in the FAC. Zwicky's 43 Motion Dismiss the original Complaint is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs shall file any further motions to amend their pleading within 30 days of this Order. (York, M)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/2017 ORDERING the modification of briefing schedule on Dan Zwicky's Motion to Dismiss 43 and the United States' Motion to Dismiss 44 . Plaintiff's opposition to the motions is currently due 5/4/2017, and reply briefs are currently due on 5/18/2017. Counsel for Defendant Zwicky and United States has graciously agreed to proceed some of his time for preparing reply briefs back to Plaintiffs to complete their o pposition to the motions so the hearing date can remain on the Court's law and motion calendar for 2:00 p.m., on 6/1/2017. The parties therefore stipulate to extend the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their opposition to the motions through Monday, 5/8/2017 at 9:00 a.m.(Becknal, R)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/12/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss 43 44 is CONTINUED from 5/4/17, to 6/1/17 at 2:00 p.m; Opposition to the Motions may be filed on or before 5/4/17, and Replies may be filed on or before 5/18/17. (Becknal, R)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/24/17: The time for the United States and defendant Dan T. Zwicky to respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including March 30, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/8/17 GRANTING plaintiffs' ex parte application to enlarge time to serve defendant Altamirano with process and to order the United States Marshals service to effect the service. The United States Marshals service is hereby ORDERED to effect service of process on defendant Rafael Altamirano. (Kastilahn, A)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/28/2016 ORDERING that defendant Zwicky shall have up to and including 2/28/2017, to respond to the Complaint. This deadline may be enlarged further depending on whether and when Plaintiffs comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). (Zignago, K.)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/2/16 ORDERING that the amended petition for an order appointing Jessica Martinez as guardian ad litem for Petitioners is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al. v. City of West Sacramento et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Martinez
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Martinez
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Ramirez
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VJM
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRM
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARM
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVM
Represented By: Douglas Robert Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Sacramento Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M. Winger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Stallions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S. Luiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan T. Zwicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Altamirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?